VT S0094 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to appointing municipal clerks and treasurers
Title
An act relating to appointing municipal clerks and treasurers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2016-01-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-01-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Temporary Senate Rule 44A, the bill was placed on the Notice Calendar for the next legislative day |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |