VT S0094 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Amendments To The Motor Vehicle Laws
Title
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Amendments To The Motor Vehicle Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on May 24, 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to Governor on May 20, 2011 | |
2011-05-04 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2011-05-04 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Flory for Committee, text | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-03 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-03 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2011-05-03 | Speaker appointed Lanpher of Vergennes, Bissonnette of Winooski and Burke of Brattleboro as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2011-05-03 | Committee of Conference appointed | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-02 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Flory, Kitchel, and Mazza | |
2011-05-02 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2011-05-02 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-05-02 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-04-29 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-04-29 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-28 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-27 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Transportation agreed to | |
2011-04-27 | Report of the Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-04-27 | Rep. Weston of Burlington, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-04-21 | Rep. Rep. Brennan of Colchester reported for the committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-27 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-26 | Action postponed until 4/27/2011 as moved by Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes | |
2011-04-22 | Action postponed until 4/25/2011 as moved by Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2011-03-29 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-03-24 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-23 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-03-23 | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-23 | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |