VT S0093 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labeling Maple Products
Title
An Act Relating To Labeling Maple Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-05-05 | Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-05-05 | Motion by Senator Starr that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-05 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-05-05 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-03 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-03 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-05-01 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-05-01 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-30 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-28 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-30 | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to. | |
2012-04-30 | Rep. Toll of Danville, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-28 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Agriculture agreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Rep. McAllister of Highgate reported for the committee on Agriculture | |
2012-04-28 | Read Second Time | |
2012-04-28 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-30 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-03-27 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-22 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-22 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-21 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2012-03-21 | Motion agreed to | |
2012-03-21 | Senator(s) Kittell motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Agriculture recommendation of amendment; text | |
2012-03-21 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Kittell for Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-21 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture | |
2012-03-20 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-23 | Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Kittell | |
2011-03-23 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Kittell | |
2011-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Kittell | |
2011-03-22 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Kittell on behalf of the Committee on Agriculture | |
2011-03-22 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-18 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Kittell on behalf of the Committee on Agriculture | |
2011-03-18 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Kittell on behalf of the Committee on Agriculture | |
2011-03-17 | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |