VT S0092 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prescription drug price transparency and cost containment
Title
An act relating to prescription drug price transparency and cost containment
Sponsors
Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] | Sen. Claire Ayer [D] | Sen. Brian Campion [D] |
Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. Michael Sirotkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2018-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Ayer |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senator Ayer moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ayer |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ayer |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-20 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-04-19 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-19 | House | Read Third time |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-18 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2018-04-18 | House | Rep. Houghton of Essex reported for the committee on Health Care |
2018-04-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |