VT S0091 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Bill Ordered to Lie
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Bill Ordered to Lie
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Privatization Of Public Schools
Title
An Act Relating To Privatization Of Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Shall the recommendation of amendment of the Committee on Education be amended as moved by Senators Sears, Benning and Nitka? (Y: 10 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Bill Ordered to Lie |
2014-04-16 | House | Rep. Peltz of Woodbury reported for the committee on Education |
2014-04-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Motion to amend bill agreed to |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Benning moved to amend bill |
2014-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on division, Yeas 19, Nays 9 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Division of the Senate Yeas 19, nays 9 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education agreed to |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment disagreed to |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) White, text |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Galbraith, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 10, Nays = 18 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment disagreed to |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, Benning, and Nitka, text |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Zuckerman for Committee on Education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator White |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Benning, and Nitka |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Consideration postponed to March 13, 2014 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Consideration postponed to March 13, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Consideration postponed to March 13, 2014 on motion of Senator McCormack |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator McCormack |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |