VT S0089 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to allowing reflective health benefit plans at all metal levels
Title
An act relating to allowing reflective health benefit plans at all metal levels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 6, 2019 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 6, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-04-12 | House | Rep. Jickling of Randolph reported for the committee on Health Care |
2019-04-12 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |