VT S0089 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-09 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-09 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Stabilization Of Prices Paid To Vermont Dairy Farmers
Title
An Act Relating To Stabilization Of Prices Paid To Vermont Dairy Farmers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-09 | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2009 | |
2009-05-09 | Delivered to Governor on May 22, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-05-08 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2009-05-08 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2009-05-08 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Starr for Committee, text | |
2009-05-08 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-05-08 | Committee of Conference Report | |
2009-05-07 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-05-07 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2009-05-07 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. O'Donnell of Vernon | |
2009-05-05 | Speaker appointed Bray of New Haven, Partridge of Windham and McAllister of Highgate as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2009-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-05-05 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Starr, Giard, and Kittell | |
2009-05-05 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Starr | |
2009-05-05 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2009-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-05-05 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2009-05-04 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-05-04 | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2009-05-04 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-05-04 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2009-05-04 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Agriculture agreed to | |
2009-05-04 | Read Second Time | |
2009-05-04 | Rep. Bray of New Haven reported for the committee on Agriculture | |
2009-05-04 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-04-22 | Committed to Committee on Agriculture by motion of Rep. Deen of Westminster | |
2009-04-21 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Rules | |
2009-04-17 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2009-04-17 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2009-04-17 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-15 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2009-04-15 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to | |
2009-04-15 | Reported without recommendation by Senator Maynard for Committee on Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Agriculture with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-04-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-15 | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2009-04-15 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Finance | |
2009-04-14 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2009-04-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2009-03-27 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture | |
2009-03-27 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture | |
2009-03-25 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |