VT S0085 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to simplifying government for small businesses
Title
An act relating to simplifying government for small businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] | Sen. Rebecca Balint [D] | Sen. Kevin Mullin [R] | Sen. Robert Starr [D] |
Sen. Richard Westman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-12 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Clarkson for Committee, text |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-11 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-11 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2018-05-01 | House | Speaker appointed Myers of Essex, Sheldon of Middlebury and Kimbell of Woodstock as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Clarkson, Soucy, and Sirotkin |
2018-04-27 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Clarkson |
2018-04-27 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-27 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-24 | House | Read Third time |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-20 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to. |
2018-04-20 | House | Rep. Hill of Wolcott reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported without recommendation by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |