VT S0085 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Patient's Privilege
Title
An Act Relating To The Patient's Privilege
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-03-23 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2009-03-23 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-03-20 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2009-03-20 | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-03-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-20 | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-03-20 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-03-17 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-13 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |