VT S0079 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Signed by Governor on March 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Signed by Governor on March 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to freedom from compulsory collection of personal information
Title
An act relating to freedom from compulsory collection of personal information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 110, Nays = 24 (Y: 110 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on March 24, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2017-03-15 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-14 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 110, Nays = 24 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-14 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Sears |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |