VT S0077 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Signed by Governor on April 19, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Signed by Governor on April 19, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Recycling And Disposal Of Electronic Waste
Title
An Act Relating To The Recycling And Disposal Of Electronic Waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Signed by Governor on April 19, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Delivered to Governor on April 13, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-03-24 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2010-03-18 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2010-03-18 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Lyons | |
2010-03-18 | Consideration resumed | |
2010-03-18 | Pending Question: Shall the Senate concur in the House proposal of amendment with a further amendment as moved by Sen. Lyons? | |
2010-03-18 | Consideration postponed | |
2010-03-17 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Lyons | |
2010-03-17 | Motion by Senator Lyons that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment | |
2010-03-17 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2010-03-17 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-03-16 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-03-16 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-03-12 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-03-12 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-03-09 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-03-09 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-02-24 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2010-02-24 | Rep. Edwards of Brattleboro moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to | |
2010-02-24 | Amendment of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to | |
2010-02-24 | Rep. Masland of Thetford reported for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-24 | Rep. Edwards of Brattleboro reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2009-04-08 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2009-04-07 | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Choate, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 4 | |
2009-04-07 | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill agreed to | |
2009-04-07 | Motion to amend recommendation of amendment disagreed to on division Yeas 7, Nays 15 | |
2009-04-07 | Consideration resumed | |
2009-04-07 | Recess ordered by President pro tempore | |
2009-04-07 | Senator(s) Campbell motion to amend recommendation of amendment; text | |
2009-04-07 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Lyons moved to amend bill | |
2009-04-07 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Campbell | |
2009-04-07 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons | |
2009-04-07 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator Campbell to the amendment to be offerred by Senator Lyons | |
2009-04-06 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator Lyons on behalf of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2009-04-06 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day | |
2009-04-03 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day | |
2009-04-02 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Senator Brock explained vote | |
2009-04-01 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 12 | |
2009-04-01 | Senator Illuzzi requested & granted leave to withdraw motion | |
2009-04-01 | Senator Illuzzi motion to order bill to lie on the table | |
2009-04-01 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to on division, 29-0 | |
2009-04-01 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as moved by SenatorSears | |
2009-04-01 | Consideration resumed | |
2009-04-01 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears | |
2009-04-01 | Pending question: Shall bill be amended as recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy? | |
2009-04-01 | Consideration Postponed | |
2009-03-31 | Consideration interrupted by adjournment | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2009-03-31 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2009-03-27 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2009-03-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2009-03-23 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |