VT S0072 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to requiring telemarketers to provide accurate caller identification information
Title
An act relating to requiring telemarketers to provide accurate caller identification information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 6/8/17 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 6/2/17 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-03 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Cummings |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Cummings; text |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-20 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-04-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senator Campion requested & granted leave to withdraw rec. of amendment of Finance of amendment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with recommendation of amendment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with report of Committee on Finance intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Cummings |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |