VT S0070 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To The Delivery Of Raw Milk At Farmers' Markets

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To The Delivery Of Raw Milk At Farmers' Markets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-10HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014
2014-05-10SenateSigned by Governor on May 27, 2014
2014-05-10SenateDelivered to Governor on May 22, 2014
2014-05-01SenateRules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2014-05-01SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2014-05-01SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2014-05-01SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2014-05-01SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2014-04-30SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2014-04-29SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2014-04-25HousePassed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2014-04-25HouseRead Third time
2014-04-25HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland, Connor of Fairfield, Lawrence of Lyndon, Martin of Springfield, Michelsen of Hardwick, Partridge of Windham, Smith of New Haven, Stevens of Shoreham, Toleno of Brattleboro, Walz of Barre City, and Zagar of Barnard moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
2014-04-24HouseThird Reading Ordered
2014-04-24HouseAmendment of Committee on Agriculture and Forest Products agreed to
2014-04-24HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forest Products
2014-04-24HouseRead Second Time
2013-03-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forest Products
2013-03-20SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2013-03-20SenatePending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) French
2013-03-20SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) French
2013-03-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2013-03-19Senate3rd reading ordered
2013-03-19SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2013-03-19SenateReported favorably by Senator French for Committee on Agriculture with recommendation of amendment
2013-03-19SenateRead 2nd time
2013-03-19SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2013-03-19SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2013-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture
2013-03-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2013-02-01SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback