VT S0069 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to an employer’s compliance with an income withholding order from another state
Title
An act relating to an employer’s compliance with an income withholding order from another state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 1, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2017-04-06 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-05 | House | Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington recommended for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-05 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |