VT S0066 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 20. 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to electric bicycles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to electric bicycles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21HouseSenate Message, signed by Governor May 20. 2021
2021-05-21SenateSigned by Governor on May 20, 2021
2021-05-14SenateDelivered to Governor on May 14, 2021
2021-05-07HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-06SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2021-05-06SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-06SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2021-05-06SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2021-05-05SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2021-05-04SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2021-05-04SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-04-30SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2021-04-28HouseRead Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-04-28HouseDivision results Yeas 103, Nays 27
2021-04-28HouseDivision demanded
2021-04-28HouseWhich was disagreed to
2021-04-28HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon moved to propose to the Senate to amend the bill
2021-04-27HouseThird Reading ordered
2021-04-27HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland agreed to
2021-04-27HouseReport of Committee on Transportation agreed to
2021-04-27HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland reported for the Committee on Transportation
2021-04-27HouseRead Second time
2021-03-26HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Transportation
2021-03-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2021-03-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-03-23Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-03-23SenateReported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance
2021-03-23SenateReported favorably by Senator Chittenden for Committee on Transportation
2021-03-23SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-23SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2021-03-23SenateFavorable report by Committee on Transportation
2021-03-23SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-03-19SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2021-03-19SenateFavorable report by Committee on Transportation
2021-03-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-03-16SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2021-03-16SenateFavorable report by Committee on Transportation
2021-03-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback