VT S0065 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to banning baby bumper pads
Title
An act relating to banning baby bumper pads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |