VT S0058 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/9/11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/9/11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Jurisdiction Of A Crime Committed When The Defendant Was Under The Age Of 16
Title
An Act Relating To Jurisdiction Of A Crime Committed When The Defendant Was Under The Age Of 16
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/9/11 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to Governor on 5/6/11 | |
2011-04-29 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2011-04-29 | House message House passed bill in concurrence | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-28 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-27 | Rep. Rep. French of Shrewsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-27 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-03-16 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-11 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-03-11 | Motion to amend bill agreed to | |
2011-03-11 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Illuzzi moved to amend bill | |
2011-03-11 | Senator Illuzzi requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment | |
2011-03-11 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Illuzzi moved to amend bill | |
2011-03-11 | Senator Illuzzi requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment | |
2011-03-11 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Illuzzi moved to amend bill | |
2011-03-11 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2011-03-11 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2011-03-11 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-09 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-03-09 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2011-03-09 | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-08 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2011-02-25 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2011-02-24 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |