VT S0054 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Enrolled on September 22 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - As passed by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the regulation of cannabis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the regulation of cannabis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Senate - Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 6 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 75 of 148 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 56 (Y: 92 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 117 (Y: 27 N: 117 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 54 (Y: 90 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 96, Nays = 49 (Y: 96 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2020-09-22SenateSenator McCormack explained vote
2020-09-22SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 6
2020-09-22SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text
2020-09-22SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2020-09-21SenateNew Business/Committee of Conference Report
2020-09-19SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2020-09-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-18SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2020-09-17HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
2020-09-17HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 75 of 148 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 56
2020-09-17HouseRep. Browning of Arlington demanded yeas and nays
2020-03-13HouseSpeaker appointed Gannon of Wilmington, LaClair of Barre Town and Ancel of Calais as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2020-03-12HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
2020-03-11SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Sears, White, and Benning
2020-03-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sears
2020-03-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2020-03-11SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-03-10SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2020-03-10SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2020-03-10SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-02-27HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2020-02-27HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Dickinson of St. Albans Town disagreed to
2020-02-27HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 117
2020-02-27HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to
2020-02-27HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Savage of Swanton agreed to
2020-02-27HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Browning of Arlington disagreed to
2020-02-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-02-26HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 54
2020-02-26HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to
2020-02-26HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Gannon of Wilmington agreed to
2020-02-26HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury and Browning of Arlington disagreed to
2020-02-26HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Young of Greensboro, Ancel of Calais, Anthony of Barre City, Brennan of Colchester, Browning of Arlington, Canfield of Fair Haven, Donovan of Burlington, Masland of Thetford, Scheu of Middlebury, and Till of Jericho agreed to
2020-02-26HouseReport of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-26HouseRep. Lanpher of Vergennes recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2020-02-26HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 96, Nays = 49
2020-02-26HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations amended as offered by Committee on Ways and Means
2020-02-26HouseRep. Young of Greensboro recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2020-02-26HouseRep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2020-02-26HouseRep. Copeland Hanzas of Bradford asked leave to withdraw the report of the committee on Government Operations
2020-02-26HouseRead Second Time
2020-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2020-01-29HouseRep. Ancel of Calais moved that the committee on Ways and Means be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Government Operations which was agreed to.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2019-03-13HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-01SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-03-01SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-02-28Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 5
2019-02-28SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2019-02-28SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2019-02-28SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2019-02-28SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
2019-02-28SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-02-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-28SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-02-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-02-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2019-02-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-02-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2019-02-19SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-01-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback