VT S0053 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 19, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 19, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Number Of Prekindergarten Children Included Within A School District's Average Daily Membership
Title
An Act Relating To The Number Of Prekindergarten Children Included Within A School District's Average Daily Membership
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Baruth [D] | Sen. William Doyle [R] | Sen. Sara Kittell [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] |
Sen. Kevin Mullin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on May 19, 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to Governor on May 13, 2011 | |
2011-04-29 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2011-04-29 | House message House passed bill in concurrence | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-28 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence | |
2011-04-28 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 129 | |
2011-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City disagreed to | |
2011-04-28 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 40, Nays = 100 | |
2011-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Olsen of Jamaica disagreed to | |
2011-04-27 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 36 | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-27 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 44, Nays = 90 | |
2011-04-27 | Floor Amendment by Rep. Komline of Dorset disagreed to | |
2011-05-03 | Rep. Rep. Pearce of Richford, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-27 | Rep. Rep. Donovan of Burlington reported for the committee on Education | |
2011-04-27 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-26 | Action postponed until 4/27/2011 as moved by Rep. Peltz of Woodbury | |
2011-04-20 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-07 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education | |
2011-04-05 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-04-05 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Mullin | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2011-03-30 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-29 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably by Senator Fox for Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Education | |
2011-03-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-29 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-25 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable report by Committee on Education | |
2011-03-24 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Education & Finance intact, on motion of Senator Kitchel | |
2011-03-16 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable report by Committee on Education | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-15 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2011-02-18 | Favorable report by Committee on Education | |
2011-02-18 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |