VT S0047 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the persons authorized to make contributions to candidates and political parties and to political committee names
Title
An act relating to the persons authorized to make contributions to candidates and political parties and to political committee names
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] | Sen. Anthony Pollina [D] | Sen. Christopher Bray [D] | Sen. Andrew Perchlik [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Pollina, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 5 (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Pollina, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 5 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |