VT S0045 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to earned discharge from probation
Title
An act relating to earned discharge from probation
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Sears [D] | Sen. Philip Baruth [D] | Sen. Joseph Benning [R] | Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
Sen. Jeanette White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 12, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 12, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 6, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-04-28 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-04-28 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2021-04-28 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2021-04-22 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-04-21 | House | Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to |
2021-04-21 | House | Rep. Dolan of Essex reported for the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2021-04-21 | House | Read Second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |