VT S0044 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to equally shared candidate campaign expenditures
Title
An act relating to equally shared candidate campaign expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Flory |
2017-03-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Pearson, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, and White, text |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |