VT S0040 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to testing and remediation of lead in the drinking water of schools and child care facilities
Title
An act relating to testing and remediation of lead in the drinking water of schools and child care facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Campion [D] | Sen. Timothy Ashe [D] | Sen. Christopher Bray [D] | Sen. Alison Clarkson [D] |
Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Richard Sears [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 3 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 3 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2019 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 17, 2019 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 11, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Baruth for Committee, text |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-08 | House | Speaker appointed Webb of Shelburne, Gregoire of Fairfield and James of Manchester as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Baruth, Ingram, and Hardy |
2019-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2019-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-06 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 3 |
2019-05-02 | House | Read Third time |
2019-05-02 | House | Rep. Shaw of Pittsford asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Rep. Shaw of Pittsford moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2019-05-02 | House | Rep. Burditt of West Rutland asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Rep. Burditt of West Rutland moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2019-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Education as amended agreed to |
2019-05-01 | House | Report of the Committee on Education amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Education amended as offered by Committee on Human Services |
2019-05-01 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-01 | House | Rep. Gregoire of Fairfield reported for the committee on Human Services |
2019-05-01 | House | Rep. Webb of Shelburne reported for the committee on Education |
2019-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-04-03 | House | Rep. Webb of Shelburne moved to commit bill to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Webb of Shelburne |
2019-02-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Baruth, Hardy, McNeil, Parent, and Perchlik |
2019-02-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |