VT S0040 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Establishing An Interim Committee That Will Develop Policies To Restore The 1980 Ratio Of State Funding To Student Tuition At Vermont State Colleges And To Make Higher Education More Affordable
Title
An Act Relating To Establishing An Interim Committee That Will Develop Policies To Restore The 1980 Ratio Of State Funding To Student Tuition At Vermont State Colleges And To Make Higher Education More Affordable
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Pollina [D] | Sen. Donald Collins [D] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. William Doyle [R] |
Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Richard Westman [R] | Sen. David Zuckerman [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill be amended as moved by Senators Galbraith and Campbell in the first instance? (Y: 5 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill be amended as moved by Senators Galbraith and Campbell? (Y: 5 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill be amended as moved by Senators Galbraith and Campbell in the first instance? (Y: 5 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill be amended as moved by Senators Galbraith and Campbell? (Y: 5 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 27, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2014-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2014-05-06 | House | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-06 | House | Read Third time |
2014-05-05 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-05-05 | House | Amendment of Committee on Education agreed to |
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Rep. Miller of Shaftsbury, recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge reported for the committee on Education |
2014-05-05 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-04-02 | House | Rep. Heath of Westford moved that the committee on Appropriations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Education which was agreed to. |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2013-05-09 | House | Rep. Donovan of Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on Education which was agreed to. |
2013-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Donovan of Burlington |
2013-04-03 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Senator Galbraith explained vote |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Pollina, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 1 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 23 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment disagreed to |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Senator Galbraith requested & granted leave to withdraw second recommendation of amendment |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Campbell and Galbraith moved to amend bill |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith and Campbell |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith and Campbell |
2013-03-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith and Campbell |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) McCormack |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education amended as moved by Senator McCormack |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senator(s) McCormack motion to amend recommendation of amendment; text |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Education |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) McCormack |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) McCormack |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) McCormack |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2013-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |