VT S0038 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-06 - Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Judiciary with the report of Committee on Judiciary . intact, on motion of Senator Sears
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-06 - Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Judiciary with the report of Committee on Judiciary . intact, on motion of Senator Sears
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Uniform Collateral Consequences Of Conviction Act
Title
An Act Relating To The Uniform Collateral Consequences Of Conviction Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Judiciary with the report of Committee on Judiciary . intact, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2011-05-06 | Called up by Senator Sears & placed on action calendar for May 7, 2011 | |
2011-03-25 | Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Sears | |
2011-03-25 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith | |
2011-03-25 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-24 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Galbraith | |
2011-03-24 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-23 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-22 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-18 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-03-18 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2011-03-18 | Senator Illuzzi requested & granted leave to withdraw motion | |
2011-03-18 | Senator Illuzzi motion to order bill to lie | |
2011-03-18 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 6, Nays = 23 | |
2011-03-18 | On motion of Senator Illuzzi, consideration of bill NOT interrupted by motion to adjourn | |
2011-03-18 | Division on Motion to Adjourn by Sen. Mazza, Not agreed to: Yeas 14, Nays 15, as requested by Senator Campbell | |
2011-03-18 | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Judiciary with recommendation of amendment | |
2011-03-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-16 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2011-03-15 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/summary.cfm?Bill=S.0038&Session=2012 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2012/bills/Intro/S-038.pdf |