VT S0037 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 10, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to access to legally protected health care activity and regulation of health care providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to access to legally protected health care activity and regulation of health care providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-21 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 114, Nays = 24 (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 115, Nays = 17 (Y: 115 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10HouseSenate Message, signed by Governor May 10, 2023
2023-05-10SenateSigned by Governor on Wednesday, May 10, 2023
2023-05-04SenateDelivered to Governor on Thursday, May 4, 2023
2023-05-01HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-04-27SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2023-04-27SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-04-27SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2023-04-27SenateHouse proposal of amendment
2023-04-26SenateHouse proposal of amendment
2023-04-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-04-26SenateHouse message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2023-04-21HousePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-04-21HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 114, Nays = 24
2023-04-21HouseRep. Laroche of Franklin demanded yeas and nays
2023-04-21HouseRead third time
2023-04-21HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2023-04-20HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-04-20HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 115, Nays = 17
2023-04-20HouseRep. Houghton of Essex Junction demanded yeas and nays
2023-04-20HouseReport of Committee on Health Care, as amended, agreed to
2023-04-20HouseRep. Houghton of Essex Junction, Black of Essex, Carpenter of Hyde Park, Cina of Burlington, Cordes of Lincoln, Farlice-Rubio of Barnet, Goldman of Rockingham, and McFaun of Barre Town moved to amend the report of the Committee on Health Care, as amended, which was agreed to
2023-04-20HouseRep. Houghton of Essex Junction moved to amend the report of the Committee on Health Care, as amended, which was agreed to
2023-04-20HouseWhich was disagreed to
2023-04-20HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the report of the Committee on Health Care, as amended
2023-04-20HouseRep. Williams of Granby asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2023-04-20HouseRep. Williams of Granby moved to amend the report of the Committee on Health Care, as amended
2023-04-20HouseRep. Higley of Lowell asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2023-04-20HouseRep. Higley of Lowell moved to amend the report of the Committee on Health Care, as amended
2023-04-20HouseRep. Houghton of Essex Junction, Berbeco of Winooski, Black of Essex, Carpenter of Hyde Park, Cina of Burlington, Cordes of Lincoln, Farlice-Rubio of Barnet, Goldman of Rockingham, and McFaun of Barre Town moved to amend the report of the Committee on Health Care, which was agreed to
2023-04-20HouseRep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2023-04-20HouseRep. Goldman of Rockingham reported for the Committee on Health Care
2023-04-20HouseRead second time
2023-04-20HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-04-19HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-04-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2023-04-18HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-03-22HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Health Care
2023-03-17SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2023-03-17SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-03-16Senate3rd reading ordered
2023-03-16SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2023-03-16SenateReported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-16SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-16SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-16SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-03-15SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2023-03-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-01SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-01-25SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback