VT S0037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Delivered to Governor on June 11, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to medical monitoring

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to medical monitoring

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 11 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 100, Nays = 42 (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 87 (Y: 55 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateDelivered to Governor on June 11, 2019
2019-05-21SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2019-05-21HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-21SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 11
2019-05-21SenateRemarks of Senator Sears journalized
2019-05-21SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-21SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-20SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2019-05-20SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-20SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-16HousePassed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-16HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 100, Nays = 42
2019-05-16HouseRead Third time
2019-05-16HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-05-16HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 87
2019-05-16HouseRep. Beck of St. Johnsbury, Houghton of Essex, Gannon of Wilmington, Bancroft of Westford, and Fagan of Rutland City moved to amend the bill
2019-05-16HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
2019-05-16HouseRep. LaLonde of South Burlington moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
2019-05-14HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-05-14HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2019-05-14HouseRep. LaLonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2019-05-14HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-19HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-03-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-03-13Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8
2019-03-13SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8
2019-03-13SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-03-12SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-01-18SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback