VT S0037 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor on June 7, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor on June 7, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Tax Increment Financing Districts
Title
An Act Relating To Tax Increment Financing Districts
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Ashe [D] | Sen. Philip Baruth [D] | Sen. Sally Fox [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] |
Sen. Diane Snelling [R] | Sen. David Zuckerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 7, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 4, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2013-05-14 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-05-14 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2013-05-14 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2013-05-14 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Ashe |
2013-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-05-13 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2013-05-13 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2013-05-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2013-05-10 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-05-10 | House | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Ways and Means agreed to |
2013-05-10 | House | Rep. Keenan of St. Albans City, recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-10 | House | Rep. Condon of Colchester, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2013-05-10 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-05-10 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2013-05-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2013-05-06 | House | Rep. Botzow of Pownal moved to commit bill to the committee on Ways and Means which was agreed to. |
2013-05-03 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2013-04-30 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved of further consideration of the bill on motion of Senator Baruth |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Rules with report of Committee on Finance intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |