VT S0034 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2009 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2009 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Agreement Among The States To Elect The President By National Popular Vote
Title
An Act Relating To The Agreement Among The States To Elect The President By National Popular Vote
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-02-27 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2009-02-27 | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 13 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 15, Nays = 10 | |
2009-02-27 | Motion to amend by Senator(s) Brock and Starr disagreed to on division Yeas 6, Nays 19 | |
2009-02-27 | Consideration resumed | |
2009-02-27 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Brock and Starr | |
2009-02-27 | Consideration Postponed | |
2009-02-25 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator White | |
2009-02-25 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Brock and Starr moved to amend bill | |
2009-02-25 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Brock and Starr | |
2009-02-25 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-02-24 | 3rd reading ordered on division, Yeas 12, Nays 9 | |
2009-02-24 | Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-02-24 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-02-24 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-02-20 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-02-19 | Second Reading | |
2009-01-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |