VT S0030 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to creating a Sister State Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to creating a Sister State Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-05HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2023-03-31SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2023-03-31SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-03-30Senate3rd reading ordered
2023-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to
2023-03-30SenateReported favorably by Senator Perchlik for Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-30SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Harrison for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-03-30SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2023-03-29SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2023-03-28SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-03-28SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-03-24SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-03-24SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-24SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-03-21SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2023-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-03-21SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-01-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback