VT S0029 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to decedents’ estates
Title
An act relating to decedents’ estates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Flory for Committee, text |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2018-05-07 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-07 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Flory, Nitka, and Benning |
2018-04-27 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2018-04-26 | House | Speaker appointed Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Grad of Moretown and Willhoit of St. Johnsbury as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-04-26 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-04-26 | House | Rep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a committee of conference |
2018-04-24 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-04-20 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Sears |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senator Sears moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-20 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-19 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-13 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-13 | House | Read Third time |
2018-04-12 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-12 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2018-04-12 | House | Rep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-12 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-06 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Motion to amend recommendation of amendment offered by Senator Benning and Flory agreed to |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment disagreed to |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Motion by Senator Sears to reconsider adoption of Sen. Benning amendment to Benning & Flory amendment, agreed to |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment, as amended agreed to |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senator Benning moved to amend motion to amend offered by Senator Benning and Flory, which was agreed to |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Benning and Flory; text |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Benning and Flory |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Benning and Flory |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning and Flory |
2018-01-30 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-01-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |