VT S0029 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-20 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-20 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Legislative Committee Subpoena Power
Title
An Act Relating To Legislative Committee Subpoena Power
Sponsors
Sen. John Campbell [D] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. Kevin Mullin [R] | Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
Sen. Richard Sears [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-20 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-02-17 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2009-02-17 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-02-13 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2009-02-13 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2009-02-13 | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-02-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-02-13 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-02-13 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2009-02-10 | Second Reading | |
2009-01-22 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |