VT S0028 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: House Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: House Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Permit Process For Protecting The Environment
Title
An Act Relating To The Permit Process For Protecting The Environment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-12 | Read 3rd time & passed on division Yeas 21, Nays 7 | |
2012-04-12 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-11 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Galbraith, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9 | |
2012-04-11 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to | |
2012-04-11 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-11 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-04-11 | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading | |
2012-04-10 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-10 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator MacDonald | |
2012-04-10 | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations | |
2012-04-06 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-05 | Committed to Committee on Appropriations with report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Cummings | |
2012-04-05 | Committee on Finance relieved of further consideration of the bill on motion of Senator Cummings | |
2012-04-04 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-04 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-01-25 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |