VT S0026 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Providing State Financial Support For School Meals For Children Of Low-income Households

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Providing State Financial Support For School Meals For Children Of Low-income Households

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-02HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
2013-03-28SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2013-03-28SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2013-03-27SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2013-03-27SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2013-03-27SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2013-03-27SenateReported favorably by Senator Fox for Committee on Appropriations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2013-03-27SenateReported favorably by Senator Collins for Committee on Education
2013-03-26SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2013-03-26SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2013-03-26SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2013-03-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2013-03-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2013-03-22SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2013-03-21SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2013-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation
2013-03-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2013-02-22SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2013-02-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2013-02-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2013-01-15SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Education

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback