VT S0026 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-09 - Signed by Governor on June 1, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Recovery Of Profits From Crime, The Disposition Of Property Upon Death, Transfer Of Interest In Vehicle Upon Death, Homestead Exemption, Unclaimed Property, Credit Card Fee Disputes, And Patient's Privilege

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Recovery Of Profits From Crime, The Disposition Of Property Upon Death, Transfer Of Interest In Vehicle Upon Death, Homestead Exemption, Unclaimed Property, Credit Card Fee Disputes, And Patient's Privilege

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-09 Signed by Governor on June 1, 2009
2009-05-09 Delivered to Governor on May 26, 2009
2009-05-07 Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2009-05-07 As passed by Senate and House
2009-05-07 Committee of Conference report adopted
2009-05-07 Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mullin for Committee, text
2009-05-07 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2009-05-07 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2009-05-07 Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill)
2009-05-07 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2009-05-05 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2009-05-05 Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mullin, Campbell, and Sears
2009-05-01 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
2009-05-01 Speaker appointed Jewett of Ripton, Flory of Pittsford and French of Shrewsbury as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2009-05-01 Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg
2009-05-01 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McDonald of Berlin
2009-04-29 House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, as moved by Senator Sears
2009-04-29 House proposal of amendment; text
2009-04-29 New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2009-04-28 House Proposal of Amendment
2009-04-22 Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2009-04-21 Read Second Time and Third Reading Ordered
2009-04-21 Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2009-04-21 Rep. Flory of Pittsford reported for the committee on Judiciary
2009-03-25 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2009-03-20 Read 3rd time & passed
2009-03-20 New Business/Third Reading
2009-03-17 3rd reading ordered
2009-03-17 Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2009-03-17 Reported favorably by Senator Mullin for Committee on Judiciary with recommendation of amendment
2009-03-17 Read 2nd time
2009-03-17 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2009-03-17 Second Reading
2009-02-27 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2009-02-27 Second Reading
2009-01-20 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback