VT S0024 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions
Pending: House Corrections and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to naming the Courthouse located at 9 Merchants Row in Rutland

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to naming the Courthouse located at 9 Merchants Row in Rutland

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions
2019-02-21SenateRead 3rd time & adopted on roll call requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0
2019-02-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-02-20SenateReported favorably by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Institutions, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2019-02-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Institutions
2019-02-20SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-02-19SenateFavorable report by Committee on Institutions
2019-02-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-01-16SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback