VT S0023 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Access To Records In Adult Protective Services Investigations
Title
An Act Relating To Access To Records In Adult Protective Services Investigations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Rules |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-04-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-04 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved of further consideration of the bill on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Rules with report of Committee on Health and Welfare intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |