VT S0022 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Vetoed by Governor & placed on notice calendar for June 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to eliminating penalties for possession of limited amounts of marijuana by adults 21 years of age and older

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to eliminating penalties for possession of limited amounts of marijuana by adults 21 years of age and older

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateVetoed by Governor & placed on notice calendar for June 21, 2017
2017-05-24SenateGovernor vetoed bill on May 24, 2017
2017-05-18SenateDelivered to Governor on May 18, 2017
2017-05-11SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-05-11SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2017-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2017-05-10HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 79, Nays = 66
2017-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-05-05HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2017-05-05SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-05SenateProposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 9
2017-05-05SenatePoint of order on ground of lack of germaneness raised by Senator Collamore overruled
2017-05-05SenateSenator Sears moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-05SenatePending Question: Shall the Senate concur in the House proposal of amendment to the Senate proposal of amendment?
2017-05-05SenateCalled Up
2017-05-06SenateCalled up by Senator Sears & placed on action calendar for May 6, 2017
2017-05-02SenateOrdered to lie on motion of Senator Sears
2017-05-02SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2017-05-02SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-01SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment
2017-05-01SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2017-04-28HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-04-28HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-04-28HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington moved to concur with the Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment with a further amendment thereto
2017-04-27HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2017-04-25SenateMotion agreed to
2017-04-25SenateSenator Sears moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
2017-04-25SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-04-25SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-04-25SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-24SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-04-24SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-04-21SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-20SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-04-20SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-19SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-18SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-04-14HousePassed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-14HouseRead Third time
2017-04-14HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington moved that the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill which was agreed to
2017-04-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-13HouseProposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-04-13HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-04-13HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-21SenatePending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Sears
2017-03-21SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-03-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-17Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-17SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-03-17SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2017-01-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback