VT S0020 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Division of the Senate Yeas 19, Nays 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Division of the Senate Yeas 19, Nays 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to permanent licenses for persons 66 years of age or older
Title
An act relating to permanent licenses for persons 66 years of age or older
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Mullin [R] | Rep. Carolyn Branagan [R] | Sen. Brian Collamore [R] | Sen. Dustin Degree [R] |
Sen. Margaret Flory [R] | Sen. Richard McCormack [D] | Sen. John Rodgers [D] | Sen. Robert Starr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Division of the Senate Yeas 19, Nays 9 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committed to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Bray |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-04-27 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-20 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife agreed to. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-20 | House | Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2017-04-20 | House | Rep. Beyor of Highgate reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-04-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2017-03-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Degree for Committee on Finance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-03-15 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |