VT S0020 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by Governor on June 2, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to establishing and regulating dental therapists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to establishing and regulating dental therapists

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-02SenateSigned by Governor on June 2, 2016
2016-06-01SenateDelivered to Governor on June 1, 2016
2016-04-29SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2016-04-29SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2016-04-29SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2016-04-29SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2016-04-27SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2016-04-28SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2016-04-28SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2016-04-26HousePassed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2016-04-26HouseRead Third time
2016-04-26HouseRep. Till of Jericho moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
2016-04-26HouseRep. Shaw of Pittsford moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to
2016-04-22HouseThird Reading Ordered
2016-04-22HouseReport of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to
2016-04-22HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 109, Nays = 32
2016-04-22HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2016-04-22HouseReport of Committee on Ways & Means agreed to.
2016-04-22HouseRep. Till of Jericho spoke for the committee on Ways & Means
2016-04-22HouseRep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations
2016-04-22HouseRep. French of Randolph reported for the committee on Human Services
2016-04-22HouseRead Second Time
2016-04-19HouseReferred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a)
2016-04-06HouseRep. Ancel of Calais moved that the committee on Ways & Means be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Government Operations which was agreed to.
2016-04-06HouseReferred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a)
2015-04-15HouseRep. Deen of Westminster moved that the committee on Rules be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to.
2015-04-08HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Rules
2015-04-03SenateRead 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 8
2015-04-02Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Mullin, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 10
2015-04-02SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare, as amended, agreed to
2015-04-02SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Government Operations
2015-04-02SenateFloor amendment # 2-4 disagreed to
2015-04-02SenateMotion to amend disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Mullin, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 7, Nays = 21
2015-04-02SenateQuestion on first divided on request of Senator Mullin
2015-04-02SenateSenator Mullin moved to amend the recommendation of amendment of the Committee on Government Operations, as amended
2015-04-02SenateRecommendation of amendment disagreed to
2015-04-02SenateSenator Snelling moved to amend the recommendation of amendment of the Committee on Government Operations, as amended
2015-04-02SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2015-04-02SenateSenator Kitchel, Ashe, Lyons, and Starr moved to amend the recommendation of amendment of the Committee on Government Operations, as amended
2015-04-02SenateSenator Kitchel requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment
2015-04-02SenateSenator Kitchel, Ashe, Lyons, and Starr moved to amend the recommendation of amendment of the Committee on Government Operations, as amended
2015-04-02SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as moved by Senator Lyons and White
2015-04-02SenateReported without recommendation by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance
2015-04-02SenateReported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations with recommendation of amendment
2015-04-02SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Health & Welfare
2015-04-03SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2015-04-02SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
2015-04-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2015-04-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare
2015-04-02SenateConsideration Postponed/Second Reading
2015-04-01SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
2015-04-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2015-04-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare
2015-04-01SenateConsideration postponed to April 2, 2015/Second Reading
2015-03-31SenateConsideration postponed April 2, 2015 on motion of Senator White
2015-03-31SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2015-03-31SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2015-03-31SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare
2015-03-31SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2015-03-27SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
2015-03-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2015-03-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare
2015-03-27SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2015-03-26SenateReported without recommendation by Committee on Finance
2015-03-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2015-03-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth & Welfare
2015-03-18SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2015-03-18SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2015-03-18SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth & Welfare
2015-02-26SenateCommitted to Committee on Government Operations with report of Committee on Health & Welfare intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Ashe
2015-02-26SenateCommittee on Finance relieved of further consideration of the bill on motion of Senator Ashe
2015-02-24SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2015-02-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth & Welfare
2015-01-16SenateCommittee on Government Operations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health & Welfare on motion of Senator White
2015-01-15SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2016/S.20
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2016/Docs/BILLS/S-0020/S-0020%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2016/Docs/BILLS/S-0020/S-0020%20As%20Passed%20by%20the%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2016/Docs/BILLS/S-0020/S-0020%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2016/Docs/ACTS/ACT161/ACT161%20As%20Enacted.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2016/50
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2016/51
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2016/53
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2016/218

Bill Comments

feedback