VT S0020 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Roll Call, requested by Senator Galbraith, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Financing Campaigns For Elected Office

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Financing Campaigns For Elected Office

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-01 Roll Call, requested by Senator Galbraith, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 9
2012-05-01 Recommendation of amendment disagreed to
2012-05-01 Committed to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Sears
2012-05-01 Senator(s) Galbraith, Pollina, Baruth, and Ashe motion to amend recommendation of amendment; text
2012-05-01 Recommendation of amendment agreed to
2012-05-01 Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2012-04-30 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-28 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-27 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-26 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-25 Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith, Ashe, Baruth, and Pollina
2012-04-25 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-24 Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith, Pollina, and Baruth
2012-04-24 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-23 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-23 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-21 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-20 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-19 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-19 Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith, Pollina, Baruth, and Ashe
2012-04-18 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2012-04-17 New Business/Second Reading
2012-04-16 Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations
2012-04-16 Entered on Notice Calendar
2011-01-21 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback