VT S0018 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to banning flavored tobacco products and e-liquids

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to banning flavored tobacco products and e-liquids

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
2023-03-30SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2023-03-30SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2023-03-29SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-03-28Senate3rd reading ordered
2023-03-28SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to
2023-03-28SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2023-03-28SenateReported favorably by Senator Chittenden for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
2023-03-28SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Gulick for Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2023-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-28SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-03-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2023-03-14SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-01-20SenateCommittee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Lyons
2023-01-18SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback