VT S0018 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Disclosure Of Tax Administration Information To Tax Representatives
Title
An Act Relating To The Disclosure Of Tax Administration Information To Tax Representatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-03-24 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-23 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-03-22 | Reported favorably by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-03-22 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-18 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-01-14 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |