VT S0018 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2009 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: House Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2009 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: House Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Limiting The Power Of Municipalities Or Deeds To Prohibit The Installation Of Solar Collectors, Clotheslines, Or Other Energy Devices Based On Renewable Resources
Title
An Act Relating To Limiting The Power Of Municipalities Or Deeds To Prohibit The Installation Of Solar Collectors, Clotheslines, Or Other Energy Devices Based On Renewable Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2009-03-24 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-03-24 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2009-03-24 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-03-23 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2009-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2009-03-23 | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-03-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-23 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-03-23 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-01-16 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |