VT S0016 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 18, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 18, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the creation of the Task Force on Equitable and Inclusive School Environments
Title
An act relating to the creation of the Task Force on Equitable and Inclusive School Environments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 18, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 18, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-12 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-05-11 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-05-07 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-07 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2021-05-05 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-04 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-05-04 | House | Report of Committee on Education agreed to |
2021-05-04 | House | Rep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Rep. Brady of Williston reported for the Committee on Education |
2021-05-04 | House | Read Second time |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2021-03-23 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Education |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Campion, Balint, Hardy, and Hooker, text |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Balint for Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hooker for Committee on Education |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campion, Balint, Hardy, and Hooker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2021-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |