VT S0015 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 18, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 18, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance Coverage For Midwifery Services And Home Births
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance Coverage For Midwifery Services And Home Births
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on May 18, 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to Governor on May 17, 2011 | |
2011-05-05 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-05 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2011-05-05 | Consideration resumed | |
2011-05-05 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2011-05-05 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-05 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-05 | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-05-05 | Read Third time | |
2011-05-05 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 115 | |
2011-05-05 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to | |
2011-05-04 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-05-04 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to | |
2011-05-03 | Rep. Rep. Pearson of Burlington reported for the committee on Health Care | |
2011-05-04 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-07 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care | |
2011-04-06 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-04-06 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-05 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-05 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to | |
2011-04-05 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Finance | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably by Senator Miller for Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably by Senator Fox for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment | |
2011-04-05 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Miller for Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-29 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-25 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare | |
2011-03-24 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare | |
2011-03-18 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Committed to Committee on Finance with report of Committee on Health and Welfare intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Cummings | |
2011-02-16 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Cummings | |
2011-02-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare | |
2011-02-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-01-14 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |