VT S0013 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-17 - Signed by Governor on March 4, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-17 - Signed by Governor on March 4, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Improving Vermont's Sexual Abuse Response System
Title
An Act Relating To Improving Vermont's Sexual Abuse Response System
Sponsors
Sen. John Campbell [D] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. Kevin Mullin [R] | Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
Sen. Richard Sears [D] | Sen. Peter Shumlin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Signed by Governor on March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Delivered to Governor on Friday, February 27, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2009-02-25 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2009-02-25 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, as moved by Senator Sears | |
2009-02-25 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2009-02-25 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator Sears on behalf of Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-02-25 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2009-02-24 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2009-02-26 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith as moved by Rep. Flory of Pittsford | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2009-02-26 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Flory of Pittsford | |
2009-02-20 | Pending the question, shall the Proposal of Amendment be amended as offered by Rep. Zuckerman of Burlington, the question was divided | |
2009-02-20 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-02-20 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 132, Nays = 2 | |
2009-02-20 | Rep. Nease of Johnson demanded yeas and nays | |
2009-02-20 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2009-02-20 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Higley of Lowell agreed to | |
2009-02-20 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 117 | |
2009-02-20 | Rep. Zuckerman of Burlington demanded yeas and nays | |
2009-02-20 | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to substitute an amendment | |
2009-02-20 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Zuckerman of Burlington disagreed to | |
2009-02-20 | First Instance of amendment agreed to | |
2009-02-20 | Pending the question, shall the Proposal of Amendment be amended as offered by Rep. Zuckerman of Burlington, Kilmartin of Newport City, and Lorber of Burlington, the question was divided | |
2009-02-20 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Haas of Rochester, Andrews of Rutland City, Clark of Vergennes, Donahue of Northfield, Donovan of Burlington, Fisher of Lincoln, Frank of Underhill, French of Randolph, Gilbert of Fairfax, McFaun of Barre Town, Mook of Bennington, Mrowicki of Putney, O'Donnell of Vernon, Orr of Charlotte, Pearce of Richford, Peltz of Woodbury, Pugh of South Burlington, Waite-Simpson of Essex, and Zenie of Colchester agreed to | |
2009-02-20 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Ainsworth of Royalton withdrawn | |
2009-02-19 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2009-02-19 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 131, Nays = 2 | |
2009-02-19 | Rep. Nease of Johnson demanded yeas and nays | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven withdrawn | |
2009-02-19 | Second Instance of amendment disagreed to | |
2009-02-19 | First Instance of amendment agreed to | |
2009-02-19 | Pending the question, shall the Proposal of Amendment be amended as offered by Rep. Crawford of Burke, the question was divided | |
2009-02-19 | Pending the question, shall the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill as reccommended by the Committee on Judiciary? Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the reccomendation which was agreed to | |
2009-02-19 | Report of Committee on Appropriations and Judiciary agreed to. | |
2009-02-19 | Read Second Time | |
2009-02-19 | Rep. Acinapura of Brandon reported for the committee on Appropriations | |
2009-02-19 | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2009-02-17 | Committed to Committee on Appropriations by motion of Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-02-17 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-01-27 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-01-23 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2009-01-23 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Illuzzi, MacDonald, Starr, Choate, and Kitchel | |
2009-01-23 | Senator White requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Miller and White moved to amend bill | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator Brock on behalf of Committee on Education | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator Sears on behalf of the Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-01-23 | Senator Sears requested & granted leave to withdraw third and fourth recommendations of amendment | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, Senator Sears on behalf of the Committee on Judiciary moved to amend bill | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Miller and White | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) White and Miller | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator Brock on behalf of Committee on Education; | |
2009-01-23 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator Sears on behalf of Committee on Judiciary; | |
2009-01-23 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-01-22 | Remarks of Senator ordered journalized on motion of Senator Sears | |
2009-01-22 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 | |
2009-01-22 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2009-01-22 | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations | |
2009-01-22 | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-01-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-01-22 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-01-22 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2009-01-22 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2009-01-22 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2009-01-22 | Placed on Notice Calendar for 1/22/2009 | |
2009-01-16 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Judiciary intact, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2009-01-16 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears | |
2009-01-09 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |