VT S0012 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by Governor on April 18, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by Governor on April 18, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Adding A Member From The Area Agencies On Aging To The Governor's Commission On Alzheimer's Disease And Related Disorders
Title
An Act Relating To Adding A Member From The Area Agencies On Aging To The Governor's Commission On Alzheimer's Disease And Related Disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Signed by Governor on April 18, 2011 | |
2011-04-15 | Delivered to Governor on April 15, 2011 | |
2011-04-08 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2011-04-08 | House message House passed bill in concurrence | |
2011-04-07 | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-04-07 | Read Third time | |
2011-04-06 | Read Second Time and Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-06 | Rep. Batchelor of Derby, recommended for the committee on Human Services | |
2011-02-18 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services | |
2011-02-16 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-02-16 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-02-15 | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-02-15 | Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Government Operations | |
2011-02-15 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-02-11 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-11 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2011-02-11 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2011-02-01 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2011-02-01 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Committee on Health and Welfare relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Ayer | |
2011-01-14 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |