VT S0011 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor April 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor April 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to limiting senatorial districts to a maximum of three members
Title
An act relating to limiting senatorial districts to a maximum of three members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor on April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-03-15 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-13 | House | Rep. Gardner of Richmond reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-13 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |