VT S0010 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to extending certain unemployment insurance provisions related to COVID-19
Title
An act relating to extending certain unemployment insurance provisions related to COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Recommendation of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 12 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2021-04-02 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Brock and Sirotkin |
2021-03-31 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 18, Nays = 12 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Consideration postponed Pending Question: Shall the bill be amended as recommended by the Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as substituted? |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Consideration interrupted by adjournment |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senator(s) Sirotkin to substitute amendment agreed to |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senator(s) Sirotkin motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs recommendation of amendment; text |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs with recommendation of amendment |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Consideration postponed to Thursday, March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Consideration postponed to Thursday, March 25, 2021 on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |